NAUTICAL MUSEUMS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is to advance the education of the public in maritime and coastal archaeology, history, geology and environment by the provision of a museum or museums as is considered necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN BOORMAN | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Michael French Dodge | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Spooner | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Dennis McDonald | Trustee | 30 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.62k | £39.52k | £104.44k | £92.69k | £108.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.26k | £31.84k | £78.88k | £106.71k | £99.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | £30.79k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/08/2015 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MARITIME AND COASTAL GEOLOGY, ENVIRONMENT, HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS AS IS CONSIDERED NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 18 May 1982 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nautical Museums Trust
Shipwreck Heritage Centre
Rock-A-Nore Road
HASTINGS
TN34 3DW
- Phone:
- 01424437452
- Email:
- info@shipwreckmuseum.co.uk
- Website:
-
shipwreckmuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window