Financial history THE FISHMONGERS' COMPANY'S FISHERIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 284888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £617.00k £1.11m £2.94m £1.63m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.91m £1.29m £1.51m £1.60m £1.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £402.00k £897.50k £2.18m £1.41m £891.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £214.00k £210.12k £217.00k £219.94k £222.55k
Income - Other £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £529
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.26m £1.48m £1.58m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £32.00k £32.77k £32.00k £28.71k £29.37k
Expenditure - Governance £7.00k £6.70k £10.00k £10.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.37m £795.33k £733.00k £1.13m £1.20m
Expenditure - Investment management £32.00k £32.77k £32.00k £28.71k £29.37k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0