MARTYR WORTHY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall facilities for use by the local community and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 July 1982: Standard registration
- MARTYR WORTHY PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- MARTYR WORTHY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY WILFRITH GREEN | Chair | 24 March 2003 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Philip Waring | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Edward Moffatt | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Victoria Elizabeth James | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Quentin Keith James | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Ffennell | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sara Phyliss Louise Mason | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
Vera Margaret Collings | Trustee | 13 May 2003 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Collings | Trustee | 29 June 1999 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ffennell | Trustee | 15 May 1987 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.31k | £26.21k | £16.48k | £9.55k | £9.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.84k | £9.30k | £8.86k | £12.01k | £7.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £122 | £212 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.91k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH MAY 1982 as amended on 22 May 2019
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MARTYR WORTHY IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARTYR WORTHY HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Lane
Martyr Worthy
Winchester
SO21 1DY
- Phone:
- 07932 973479
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window