Financial history THE HEBRIDEAN TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 285629
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £164.00k £173.04k £100.08k £141.93k £60.41k
Total expenditure £174.00k £145.55k £82.79k £155.38k £395.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £90.90k £3.00k