The Inside Out Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FINANCIAL GRANTS TO EX-OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 December 1982: Standard registration
- The Inside Out Trust (Working name)
- BERKSHIRE CARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stefan Fafinski DL | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucy Violet Zeal DL | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Yuki Beardmore-Gray JP | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Reid JP | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Woodley JP | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Gore | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Eric Barker MStJ DL | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Anais Bajwa | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Blake JP | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDSEY ANNE BEARD JP DL | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.72k | £21.12k | £18.30k | £19.88k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.60k | £12.24k | £12.67k | £14.27k | £11.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH AUGUST 1982 REPLACED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AT MEETING HELD ON 22ND NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 29 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 2014 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 SEP 2020 as amended on 15 Jan 2025 as amended on 15 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED AMONG OFFENDERS WHO ARE UNDER THE SUPERVISION OF THE PROBATION SERVICES OR ANY OTHER GOVERNMENT APPROVED ORGANISATION RESPONSIBLE FOR THE SUPERVISION OF OFFENDERS UNDER COURT ORDERS OR PRISON LICENCES IN THE THAMES VALLEY. PROVIDED THAT THE TRUST SHALL NOT APPLY ANY PART OF ITS FUNDS DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS, BUT MAY APPLY FUNDS IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.?
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Shepherds Way
CROWTHORNE
RG45 6AJ
- Phone:
- 07981341590
- Email:
- info@berkshirecaretrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window