Financial history The 3H Foundation

Charity number: 286306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £148.24k £229.52k £202.06k £236.18k £176.50k
Total expenditure £130.69k £178.83k £209.86k £236.31k £256.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A