Financial history TOADS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 286490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £156.94k £26.96k £99.96k £191.91k £209.78k
Total expenditure £144.76k £59.99k £141.35k £178.78k £197.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.05k N/A N/A N/A