Financial history EDUCATIONAL TRUST NO 1 1982

Charity number: 286516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £84.40k £59.09k £46.91k £71.41k £98.36k
Total expenditure £156.03k £134.44k £111.03k £86.55k £76.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A