THE MILTON GLEE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a choir, and we sing. We perform 2 to 3 concerts a year at the Portsmouth Guildhall, and we perform a suitable work at a Church at Easter time. We also regularly perform charity concerts in aid of local charities such as the Fareham branch of the Parkinson's Society. We also give donations to local charities and grants to young people to attend a summer music school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 13 April 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MINNELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clare Brown | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Mather | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Upton | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HORNER | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Marcus Lee Saunders | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Husselby | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Madge Hull | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ADAMS | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA GWYNETH STIMPSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.46k | £9.21k | £10.68k | £17.71k | £16.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.38k | £9.77k | £17.91k | £29.44k | £22.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/02/1983 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1990 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2012 as amended on 22 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL TO INCREASE THEIR UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC. (B)TO ORGANISE AND PERFORM CONCERTS CELEBRATING THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC. (C) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO LOCAL CHARITIES AND FAITH ORGANISATIONS EITHER BY THE DIRECT DONATION OF CASH OR THE PERFORMANCE OF CONCERTS.
Area of benefit
MILTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Firs Avenue
WATERLOOVILLE
Hampshire
PO8 8RR
- Phone:
- 02392596113
- Email:
- info@miltongleeclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window