THE SOCIETY FOR ITALIC HANDWRITING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encourging the use of better handwriting especially Italic handwriting. Forming where possible teaching seminars or similar activities. Publishing magazines and other literature for the betterment of handwriting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FOSTER NEVILLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK FRANCIS RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON WRATTEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.42k | £3.53k | £3.56k | £3.87k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £3.67k | £3.41k | £3.91k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN RELATION TO HANDWRITING GENERALLY, AND PARTICULARLY INSOFAR AS CONCERNS ITALIC HANDWRITING AND ASSOCIATED TECHNIQUES, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING SHALL SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ORCHARD LANE
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0BN
- Phone:
- 02082240632
- Email:
- wratten8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window