Financial history GLOUCESTERSHIRE ARTHRITIS TRUST

Charity number: 288346
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £71.29k £30.46k £52.80k £54.75k £36.43k
Total expenditure £56.38k £86.66k £42.35k £52.42k £56.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A