Financial history LONDON SKILLS FOR GROWTH LIMITED

Charity number: 288465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.76m £528.00k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.10m £1.21m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50m £499.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £106.66k £18.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.57m £506.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £16 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £87.06k £4.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.10m £617.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £588.00k N/A N/A N/A