Financial history NATIONAL HEDGELAYING SOCIETY

Charity Number: 288850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.55k £43.31k £68.57k £64.08k £88.31k
Total expenditure £5.42k £35.95k £44.08k £65.92k £68.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A