CARE FOR LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST ANNE'S) COMMERCIAL ROAD TRUST (USUALLY KNOWN AS CARE FOR ST ANNE'S)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration and future maintenance of Limehouse Parish Church (St Anne's) Commercial Road E14 as one of the major examples of European baroque architecture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 09 March 1984: Standard registration
- CARE FOR ST ANNES (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ST ANNES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN BUSCOMBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Charles Ng | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Reddaway | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter William Hogg | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL WHITNALL | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Richard Bray | Trustee | 14 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.77k | £12.59k | £15.00k | £12.97k | £12.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.36k | £8.73k | £10.76k | £2.44k | £14.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 FEB 1984 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE WORK OF CARE FOR ST. ANNE'S NAMELY THE RESTORATION AND FUTURE MAINTENANCE OF LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST. ANNE'S) COMMERCAL ROAD AS ONE OF THE MAJOR EXAMPLES OF EUROPEAN BAROQUE ARCHITECTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Newell Street
London
E14 7HP
- Phone:
- 02079871502
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window