ACADEMY OF ST MARTIN IN THE FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity during the year were the promotion and advancement of musical education for public benefit, and the support of the practice and performance of chamber orchestra music by the giving of public concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,274,868
Donations and legacies | £494.60k | |
Charitable activities | £2.23m | |
Other trading activities | £50.07k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £496.70k |
Total expenditure:
£3,060,046
Raising funds | £212.93k | |
Charitable activities | £2.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,489 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £212.93k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.85m | |
Retained for future use | £214.82k |
People

10 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Australia
- Austria
- Canada
- China
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Japan
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Netherlands
- Poland
- South Korea
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 27 April 1984: Standard registration
- ACADEMY OF ST MARTIN IN THE FIELDS (Working name)
- ACADEMY CONCERTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
martin ernst fraenkel | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Arthur Wang | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Hensel | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Cattell | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew Marriner | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Clare Hinkson Lipper | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Godson | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Marie Nicole Deschamps | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Philip Durrance Smissen | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew John Mackintosh | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Lessels | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Louise Boyes | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Anne Pierrette Aymerich | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Alan Powell | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26m | £2.81m | £1.02m | £2.66m | £3.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37m | £2.81m | £1.08m | £2.57m | £3.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.87k | £53.63k | £104.11k | £13.50k | £8.49k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £297.80k | £521.75k | £771.63k | £319.40k | £494.60k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £50.97k | £146.62k | £31.91k | £26.83k | £50.07k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.77m | £1.94m | £100.78k | £1.97m | £2.23m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £146.55k | £197.59k | £119.52k | £353.34k | £496.70k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.22m | £2.63m | £939.97k | £2.44m | £2.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £147.92k | £176.37k | £135.38k | £131.11k | £212.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.63k | £54.25k | £50.43k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.19k | £4.74k | £2.47k | £1.55k | £16.94k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £929.92k | £844.61k | £851.68k | £1.10m | £1.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £150.49k | £61.46k | £117.78k | £270.68k | £392.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1984, AMENDED 4 MAY 2000 AND 29 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 06 Aug 2020 as amended on 07 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION FOR THE DIFFUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF INFORMATION ABOUT MUSIC AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLICãS TASTE FOR MUSIC 2. THE PROMOTION OR SUPPORT OF THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHAMBER ORCHESTRAL AND CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY THE GIVING OF PUBLIC CONCERTS 3. WITH A VIEW TO PROVIDING THE PUBLIC WITH BETTER MUSICIANS AND CONDUCTORS, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TOWARDS THE EDUCATION OF AND THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL PRIZES SCHOLARSHIPS OF AWARDS TO ANY ONE OR MORE PERSON(S) WHO MAY BE MUSICIANS OR STUDENTS OF MUSIC, PROFESSIONAL OR AMATEUR, AND WHOSE WORK OR STUDY SHALL BE DEVOTED WHOLLY OR PARTLY TO PLAYING OF ANY ORCHESTRAL INSTRUMENT OR THE CONDUCTING OF ANY ORCHESTRA OR CHOIR AS THE COUNCIL MAY IN ITS DISCRETION THINK FIT 4. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL DISTRESS AMONGST MUSICIANS, CONDUCTORS, SINGERS OR OTHERS WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE PERFORMANCE, MANAGEMENT OR COMPOSITION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Dean St
Soho
W1D 6AF
- Phone:
- 02077021377
- Email:
- info@asmf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window