FINCHLEY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FSO aims to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music by the presentation of public concerts and recitals and by such other means as the society, shall determine from time to time. The society aims to provide a high standard of orchestral and performance opportunities for amateur musicians from Finchley and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 18 May 1984: Standard registration
- F C O (Working name)
- FINCHLEY CHAMBER ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Lee | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hartness | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Garry | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALICE ELIZABETH GRAY | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Janice Twiselton | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARY COOK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.36k | £10.22k | £4.39k | £19.92k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.23k | £10.78k | £3.52k | £20.33k | £17.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.36k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Reddings
Welwyn Garden City
AL8 7LA
- Phone:
- 01707372002
- Email:
- info@finchleysymphony.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window