Trustees MARLOW AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 289444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey John LAVERS Chair 09 October 2012
MARLOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Michael Anthony BASNETT CBE Trustee 24 April 2025
None on record
Ian Howard BENNING Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Ian BAINES MBE Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
James STACEY BEM Trustee 15 January 2016
None on record
George Gibson FLETT Trustee 01 January 2014
MARLOW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Maria Davis Trustee 10 March 2010
None on record