TOWER HAMLETS ENVIRONMENT TRUST

Charity number: 289632
Charity is insolvent

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We improve the social, economic, and physical environment for community benefit

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ENVIRONMENT TRUST (Working name)
  • THE ENVIRONMENT TRUST (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR NICK FOX Chair
None on record
PATRICK THOMAS STREETER Trustee
SPITALFIELDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
Received: 66 days late
Caroline Evans Trustee
Leukaemia UK
Received: On time
ROWENA JANE ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
DR MICHAEL BASIL DEMPSEY Trustee
None on record
MARIA ROSARIO NOBLE Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE COOPER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £601.33k £470.75k £1.20m £595.39k £645.05k
Total expenditure £770.55k £505.36k £761.92k £731.22k £696.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £2.39k £107.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £245.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £172.18k £474.69k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £166.61k £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £9.21k £63.37k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £611.34k £686.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.91k £10.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £108.97k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £3.58m £4.29m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £1.72m £2.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £3.99m £5.38m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HARRIS LIPMAN
2/3 MOUNTVIEW COURT
310 FRIERN BARNET LANE
LONDON
N20 0YZ
Phone:
No information available