Financial history EYNSHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 289726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.49k £17.53k £29.46k £34.47k £34.77k
Total expenditure £22.56k £8.00k £44.87k £16.81k £13.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A