Financial history INDEPENDENT GREEK EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE OF BARNET

Charity Number: 291348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £178.53k £144.66k £204.88k £223.29k £267.59k
Total expenditure £171.12k £156.52k £195.64k £216.88k £249.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A