THE FITZWILLIAM MUSEUM DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage, promote and educate the public in the fine arts through its support of the Fitzwilliam Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 09 April 1985: Standard registration
- THE FITZWILLIAM MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY MEREDYTH PROBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
David Fahie | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Catherine Elizabeth Jane Arnold | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor, The Lord Robert Mair | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Luke Syson | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
LOUISE Cooke | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
ALEXANDER JOHN SCOTT-BARRETT | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Barby | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
LADY JULIET TADGELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PENELOPE ANN HYLTON ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.44k | £256.24k | £18.03k | £15.36k | £16.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.18k | £723.02k | £86.87k | £109.35k | £124.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 June 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 June 2020 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH MARCH 1985. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 11 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE FINE ARTS THROUGH ITS SUPPORT OF THE FITZWILLIAM MUSEUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FITZWILLIAM MUSEUM
TRUMPINGTON STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1RB
- Phone:
- 01223332921
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window