Financial history THE ONSLOW LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 291923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.02k £744 £900 £1.63k £1.64k
Total expenditure £94 £1.93k £2.50k £3.50k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A