THE SOUTH PARK COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This ecumenical Trust works in Communications, which includes media, publishing and the performing arts; and Education, which includes speaking, lecturing, consultancy and mentoring. It both accepts commissions and develops its own projects. It has a special care for the poor. It is not a funding agency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
JILL MAHONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN ONEILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.70k | £9.28k | £31.61k | £2.25k | £16.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.72k | £236.82k | £130.26k | £105.24k | £189.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2019
(These accounts |
19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JULY 1985
Charitable objects
FOR CHRISTIAN AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO EXPRESS THE TESTAMENT OF CHRIST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 James Street
OXFORD
OX4 1EX
- Phone:
- 01865 958523
- Email:
- pbeall8581@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window