Financial history PULBOROUGH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 292359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.71k £14.59k £15.73k £22.88k £37.62k
Total expenditure £22.91k £19.90k £29.20k £29.20k £36.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.25k £3.10k £2.75k £5.42k £8.00k