THE BRITISH VACUUM COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and advance the understanding and teaching of vacuum science, technology and its applications by: (a) co-ordinating and promoting conferences, seminars and courses (b) encouraging excellence amongst postgraduate research workers (c) recognising distinguished research (d) representing Great Britain on the International Union of Vacuum Science, Technique, and its Applications (IUVSTA)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 1985: Standard registration
- B V C (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Timo Gans | Chair | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Prof Deborah O'Connell | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Steven Schofield | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Dr Ronald John Reid | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR MARTIN ROBERT STEWART MCCOUSTRA BSC DSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £1.34k | £1.25k | £1.57k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.73k | £1.82k | £1.52k | £1.42k | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 26TH APRIL 1989 AND 17TH JULY 2001 as amended on 17 Mar 2022 as amended on 27 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
The aims and objects of the Council are to promote and advance the understanding and teaching of vacuum science, technology and its applications by: a) co-ordinating and promoting conferences, seminars, courses, and publications in these fields b) encouraging excellence amongst postgraduate students, post-doctoral and other early-stage research workers in these fields c) recognising excellence in these fields by the awarding of prizes d) representing Great Britain and Ireland on the International Union of Vacuum Science, Technique, and its Applications (IUVSTA) e) any other similar charitable purposes as the Trustees shall determine from time to time.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 OLDFIELD DRIVE
VICARS CROSS
CHESTER
CH3 5LW
- Phone:
- 01244342675
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window