HEARING DOGS FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity Number: 293358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's objects are the promotion of health and the relief of sickness in particular by training, providing and supporting animal assisted intervention in the relief of human deafness, disability, sickness, suffering or distress, collaborating with other charities where appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Guernsey
  • Ireland
  • Jersey
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 January 1986: Standard registration
  • 14 December 2017: Funds received from 264809 HEARING LINK
  • 25 October 2022: Funds received from 1072486 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF EGREMONT BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 13 May 2025: Funds received from 801583 THE COMPASS DOGS TRUST
  • 14 May 2025: Funds received from 1055022 OPEN COLLEGE OF SIGN LANGUAGE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HEARING DOGS FOR THE DEAF (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Anthony Leslie Marshall Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Thomas Werner Bruno Schultz Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Paul Richard Gillman Davis Trustee 17 May 2022
BRIGHT GRAHAME MURRAY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Heather Self Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Dr Rachel Alison Casey Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Charles Christian McKay Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Heath Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Emily Martha Burness MBA Trustee 11 May 2021
EAST AFRICA CHARACTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Kathryn Ann England Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record
Christina Margaret Patricia O'Donovan-Rossa Trustee 07 November 2018
None on record
Barry Stephen Downes Trustee 13 February 2018
None on record
Professor Richard Thomas Ramsden FRCS MBE Trustee 13 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.39m £12.28m £13.74m £12.09m £13.10m
Total expenditure £9.85m £9.49m £11.23m £12.19m £13.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £19.19k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.70k £508.45k £38.48k N/A £500
Income - Donations and legacies £9.20m £11.02m £12.39m £10.45m £11.76m
Income - Other trading activities £1.03m £546.01k £1.12m £1.20m £608.79k
Income - Charitable activities £21.68k £51.60k £69.56k £89.42k £197.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £89.04k £83.76k £70.48k £272.00k £464.98k
Income - Other £52.68k £579.11k £49.90k £74.35k £69.96k
Income - Legacies £5.68m £6.84m £9.13m £6.47m £7.16m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.55m £7.33m £8.34m £9.50m £10.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.31m £2.15m £2.89m £2.69m £2.96m
Expenditure - Governance £67.48k £73.83k £77.17k £77.42k £102.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £48.79k £48.20k £55.30k £55.30k £41.68k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £7.64m £7.50m £7.10m £7.48m £7.46m
Long-term investments £7.28m £8.71m £9.93m £9.09m £9.96m
Other assets £4.04m £7.09m £9.77m £9.31m £9.17m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £720.30k £874.94k £1.28m £700.07k £796.46k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEARING DOGS FOR DEAF PEOPLE
THE GRANGE
WYCOMBE ROAD
SAUNDERTON
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
HP27 9NS
Phone:
01844348100