ST JOHN'S NORFOLK CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of religion and, for the benefit of the people of Norfolk and of the Norwich Diocese, the preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, extension, beautification and reconstruction of churches or chapels of the Church of England in Norfolk or in the Norwich Diocese.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships |
---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN IRVING PORDHAM | Trustee | 06 December 1985 |
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £397 | £310 | £361 | £407 | £428 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, EXTEND, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT CHURCHES OR CHAPELS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE SAID COUNTY OR THE SAID COUNTY OR THE SAID DIOCESE AND THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN SUCH CHURCHES AND CHAPELS; AND THE CHUCHYARDS BELONGING TO SUCH CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND DIOCESE OF NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Mews
Arlington Lane
NORWICH
NR2 2BY
- Phone:
- 07774847903
- Email:
- pordham@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window