THE SURREY COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement of agriculture and agricultural employees in their various crafts and to promote good farming, breeding and rearing livestock and horses. This is put into practice by organising annual Farms Competitions, a Ploughing Match and Country Fair, Agricultural Machinery Demonstrations and Long Service Awards and the annual Surrey County Show.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £21,724 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 January 1986: Standard registration
- SCAS (Working name)
- SURREY COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- SURREY COUNTY SHOW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN QUENTIN WARBURTON THOMPSON | Chair | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Christine Patch | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PETERS | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Laurence Noel Grant | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Giles William Rees | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Whittington | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JASON HOWARD DOBSON | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS JILL BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R ANGUS J STOVOLD | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL ANDREW IBBOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £505.74k | £449.09k | £437.53k | £400.98k | £39.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £538.46k | £555.01k | £533.43k | £388.42k | £126.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £21.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £459.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £18.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £528.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1019 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1019 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2020
(These accounts |
14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 26TH JUNE 1985
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURE BY PROMOTING IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING,REARING AND HEALTH OF LIVESTOCK, THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRRICULTURAL PRODUCE AND INVENTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF SAFETY OF AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENTS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SKILL IN INDUSTRY AND HUSBANDRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lydling Farm
Puttenham Lane
Shackleford
GODALMING
Surrey
GU8 6AP
- Phone:
- 01483890810
- Email:
- scas@surreycountyshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window