Trustees KENT FIELD CLUB

Charity number: 293645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN TITTLEY Chair 16 March 2025
KENT & MEDWAY BIOLOGICAL RECORDS CENTRE
Received: On time
Susan Buckingham Trustee 16 March 2025
None on record
Dr LESLEY JANE MASON Trustee 16 March 2025
None on record
Susan Skipp Trustee 19 March 2023
None on record
Richard Moyse Trustee 21 March 2021
KENT & MEDWAY BIOLOGICAL RECORDS CENTRE
Received: On time
Kate Fidczuk-Sterry Trustee 17 March 2019
None on record
Dr SARAH ELIZABETH JOAN ARNOLD Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record
Brian Mason Trustee 18 July 2012
None on record
KATHY FRIEND Trustee
None on record