THE OXFORD FARMING CONFERENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims and objectives of the Charity as stated in the governing documents are broad and,whilst mainly educational,go beyond the principal activity of running a successful Annual Conference.The Conference theme,programme and sponsorship are driven by the Council whose members chair sessions,host speakers and receptions and steward the Conference and the Debate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mario Caccamo | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hill | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Sheena Horner | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TURNER | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Beth Kay | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jude Martin McCann | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Martha Latto | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Navratnam Partheeban | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Capper | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Sansome | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £385.73k | £117.75k | £240.86k | £425.26k | £414.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.24k | £119.45k | £247.07k | £445.96k | £459.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ARTICLES AND MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH MARCH 1968 AS AMENDED 7TH JANUARY
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE IMPROVED USE OF LAND FOR FOOD PRODUCTION AND OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Growers Association Ltd
BGA House
Nottingham Road
LOUTH
Lincolnshire
LN11 0WB
- Phone:
- 01507 602427
- Email:
- Secretariat@OFC.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window