Financial history THE STANTON BALLARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 294688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £201.75k £197.59k £207.98k £217.68k £231.32k
Total expenditure £173.73k £164.45k £169.43k £191.85k £248.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A