Trustees THE STANTON BALLARD CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 294688

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY JOAN TATE | Chair |
|
||||||
NIGEL MORGAN | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Thomas | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILSDON | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER IMPEY | Trustee | 10 January 2013 |
|
|||||
HOWARD MINNS | Trustee | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
TONY WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.