Financial history HOE BRIDGE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 295808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.82m £5.91m £6.41m £7.22m £8.80m
Total expenditure £5.69m £5.84m £6.24m £6.88m £8.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £92.95k £79.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £57.23k £92.95k £79.59k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.82m £5.91m £5.83m £6.50m £7.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £518.97k £628.32k £950.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.69m £5.84m £6.24m £6.88m £8.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £15.86k £18.69k £21.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0