Financial history CONSUMERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £91.17m £88.87m £86.67m £87.42m £83.15m
Total expenditure £83.49m £84.62m £84.86m £86.20m £87.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £90.48m £88.05m £85.54m £83.62m £81.54m
Income - Charitable activities £266.00k £289.00k £324.00k £162.00k £155.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £401.00k £425.00k £459.00k £506.00k £1.07m
Income - Other £26.00k £108.00k £353.00k £3.14m £393.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.91m £23.55m £22.20m £22.50m £22.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.58m £61.07m £62.67m £63.70m £65.30m
Expenditure - Governance £760.00k £840.00k £764.00k £896.00k £886.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £141.00k £157.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £46.00k £24.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0