Trustees LIGHTHOUSE ARTS AND TRAINING LTD

Charity number: 296404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Lloyd Chair 16 February 2022
None on record
Polly Wright Trustee 24 November 2023
None on record
Laura Wade Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
Rebecca Groves Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
Michael Cole Trustee 13 February 2020
None on record
Elliott Cushnie Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Tony Pilgrim Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
ANTONY GOSTYN Trustee
THE DIRECTORS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time