Financial history FINTON HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 296588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.23m £5.58m £6.12m £7.06m £7.74m
Total expenditure £5.13m £5.65m £5.88m £6.46m £6.91m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £144.98k £105.48k £130.87k £383.68k £179.36k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.02m £5.42m £5.94m £6.54m £7.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.78k £32.96k £31.88k £111.39k £336.04k
Income - Other £17.70k £21.52k £11.68k £19.28k £26.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.11m £5.63m £5.85m £6.43m £6.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.63k £23.96k £30.40k £27.98k £45.28k
Expenditure - Governance £220.71k £219.17k £216.03k £172.39k £136.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.25k £22.44k £28.41k £5.95k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0