IAIN RENNIE HOSPICE AT HOME

Charity number: 297847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Iain Rennie Hospice at Home is part of RGHC which provides palliative care for adults and children who have been diagnosed with cancer or another life limiting illness in Herts & Bucks. Through our 24/7 responsive hospice at home service, our specialist nurses give patients the choice to be cared for at home. We also offer support services for families and, in Herts, a range of day services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £33,312
Total expenditure: £39,903

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • IAIN RENNIE NURSES (Working name)
  • IAIN RENNIE NURSING SERVICE (Working name)
  • THE HOSPICE ON THE DOORSTEP (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Russell-Hogg Trustee 26 January 2023
RENNIE GROVE PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
ST ALBANS AND DACORUM DAY HOSPICE
Received: On time
PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
JOHN VINCENT WROE Trustee 28 March 2019
PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time
ST ALBANS AND DACORUM DAY HOSPICE
Received: On time
RENNIE GROVE PEACE HOSPICE CARE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.01k £0 £0 £0 £33.31k
Total expenditure £783.00k £6.59k £6.59k £6.59k £39.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Grove House
Waverley Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL3 5QX
Phone:
01727731006