VICTIM SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Victim Support is the independent charity for victims and witnesses of crime in England and Wales. Our services are free of charge and confidential. Whether you are a victim or a witness of a crime our help falls into three main kinds; emotional support; information; practical help. We also speak out as a national voice for victims and witnesses and campaign for change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£50,383,000
Donations and legacies | £177.00k | |
Charitable activities | £48.90m | |
Other trading activities | £376.00k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £931.00k |
Total expenditure:
£50,772,000
Raising funds | £171.00k | |
Charitable activities | £50.60m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £38,848,763 from 68 government contract(s) and £10,050,237 from 40 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £171.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £50.60m |
People

1230 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
408 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 15 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- VICTIM SUPPORT (Working name)
- NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF VICTIM SUPPORT SCHEMES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Thomas | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Marion Richards | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Collins | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Green | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Gascoigne | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sudipto Chatterjee | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Steen | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Gillatt | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clarisse Mallem | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Evans | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hamilton-Stanley | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.62m | £41.04m | £44.35m | £48.30m | £50.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.81m | £40.18m | £43.37m | £48.54m | £50.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £25.01m | £28.24m | £30.58m | £34.48m | £38.85m | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.70m | £9.40m | £9.24m | £9.53m | £10.05m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £232.00k | £116.00k | £329.00k | £65.00k | £177.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £440.00k | £529.00k | £479.00k | £419.00k | £376.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £36.84m | £39.77m | £41.99m | £46.20m | £48.90m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £85.00k | £612.00k | £1.55m | £1.62m | £931.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £178.00k | £39.00k | £230.00k | £8 | £22.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £37.63m | £40.00m | £43.20m | £48.42m | £50.60m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £184.00k | £178.00k | £174.00k | £121.00k | £171.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.00k | £28.00k | £43.00k | £43.00k | £78.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.07m | £523.00k | £318.00k | £891.00k | £1.71m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £10.92m | £16.34m | £17.84m | £16.18m | £13.41m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.78m | £7.80m | £8.12m | £7.27m | £5.72m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/08/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 APR 2016 as amended on 28 Feb 2020 as amended on 13 Nov 2020 as amended on 09 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
A) For the public benefit, to reduce the distress, adverse financial impact and disadvantageous effects on present and potential victims and witnesses of crime, traumatic events and other forms of harmful behaviour, as well as on others touched by the distress of those individuals who are in need, in particular by promoting and providing services that provide emotional and practical support; B) To advance public education and awareness by research into, and analysis of, issues relating to victims and witnesses of crime, traumatic events and other forms of harmful behaviour, their families and friends and others affected, and to disseminate the results to bring about positive change.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victim Support
Building 3
Eastern Business Park
Wern Fawr Lane
Old St. Mellons
CARDIFF
- Phone:
- 02072680259
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window