Financial history THE PETERSFIELD COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 298408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.02k £28.70k £45.93k £33.73k £58.88k
Total expenditure £20.50k £22.53k £31.37k £32.75k £55.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.60k £10.00k £10.00k