THE SCHOOL SISTERS OF NOTRE DAME TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold investments and to apply the income for the promotion of education and, in particular, the creation of scholarships or bursaries to be awarded to pupils at Lingfield College (formerly Notre dame School Lingfield).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 May 1988: Standard registration
- 30 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 30 November 2018: Funds transferred to 295598 LINGFIELD COLLEGE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.07k | £2.73k | £46 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £794 | £61.90k | £26.33k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 19 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD AUGUST 1987 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 20TH APRIL 1988 AND 21ST APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE CREATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS AT THE NOTRE DAME SCHOOL, LINGFIELD, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window