Financial history THE MUSLIM SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI JAMAAT OF ESSEX

Charity Number: 299621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £763.05k £1.05m £312.13k £235.54k £219.60k
Total expenditure £57.01k £42.35k £52.79k £65.60k £88.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £762.51k £1.05m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £535 £27 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.77k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £32.01k £20.27k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £720 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £1.22k £22.08k N/A N/A N/A