VILLAGE HALL ASTON TIRROLD AND ASTON UPTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village hall provides a venue for such village and local activities as: a weekly outreach post office service and informal cafe, indoor sport such as bowls and badminton, brownie "camps", villages club and organisation meetings, other charitable fundraising activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £1,219 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 July 1962: Standard registration
- THE ASTONS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Seymour Imbush | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Anne Peterson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Martin | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Hill | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Emily West | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Binder | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Morant | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.06k | £25.98k | £32.34k | £13.76k | £14.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.09k | £15.59k | £21.00k | £14.71k | £17.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.49k | £12.76k | £2.57k | £1.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1945
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ASTON TIRROLD AND ASTON UPTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalk Well House
Frimley Yard
Aston Upthorpe
DIDCOT
Oxfordshire
OX11 9FJ
- Phone:
- 07778213496
- Email:
- c.hawker433@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window