Financial history KINTBURY CORONATION VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.78k £21.60k £13.29k £15.44k £16.11k
Total expenditure £15.06k £13.99k £15.35k £20.47k £13.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.91k N/A N/A N/A