AVONMOUTH UNIT 15 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a voluntary youth organization for boys and girls aged between 10 and 18. Providing activities aimed at helping young people towards responsible adulthood by encouraging valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct using a nautical theme based on the customs of the RN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 January 1964: Standard registration
- 22 February 2023: Funds received from 1041351 THE PRIDE OF BRISTOL TRUST
- AVONMOUTH SEA CADET CORP (Working name)
- T S ENTERPRISE (Working name)
- TS ENTERPRISE AVONMOUTH UNIT THE SEA CADETS CORPS (Working name)
- AVONMOUTH UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Miller | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Batt | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cee MacDonald | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Rummels | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Fowler | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
DR LEONARD JACOBS | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.46k | £2.94k | £29.88k | £7.74k | £62.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.91k | £862 | £32.69k | £19.11k | £59.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 Station Road
Shirehampton
BRISTOL
BS11 9XA
- Phone:
- 01179823938
- Email:
- Avonmouthseacadets@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window