4TH ROCHFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education & Training of young people to teach them, amongst other things, self respect, self reliance, survival, discipline and respect for others by means of various indoor and outdoor activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 15 January 1964: Standard registration
- 4TH ROCHFORD BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Houstin | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Neobard | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
William John NEOBARD | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Knight | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Smale | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John William Davis | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Martin | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Bean | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Susan Humphries | Trustee | 20 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM STAPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.19k | £24.96k | £24.44k | £31.10k | £21.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.01k | £14.30k | £21.75k | £34.61k | £29.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE ROCHFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Church Walk
Rochford
Essex
SS4 1NL
- Phone:
- 01702204835
- Email:
- info@4th-rochford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window