Financial history 14TH ITCHEN SOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302304
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £21.65k £39.14k £19.83k £22.69k £19.78k
Total expenditure £19.39k £25.12k £20.39k £26.65k £24.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.91k £19.91k N/A N/A £1.29k