WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the mental, physical and spiritual well being of young people, especially those in poor circumstances resident in the London Borough of Croydon, by providing facilities for their education and recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 December 1961: Standard registration
- CROYDON BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD GORDON HANDLEY HANDLEY MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Oumaduth Sauba | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD WRAGG | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
DAVID JOHN MILSTED | Trustee | 02 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
MRS K ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.54k | £15.55k | £20.12k | £18.71k | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.50k | £10.12k | £23.38k | £6.07k | £6.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 372 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE IS A CLUB FOR THE PURPOSES OF HELPING AND EDUCATING YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Orchard Garden Centre
171 St. James's Road
CROYDON
CR0 2BY
- Phone:
- 02086541006
- Email:
- wycatcoc@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window