Financial history CLYRO VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1064835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.04k £10.44k £961 £12.80k £21.36k
Total expenditure £3.60k £2.08k £2.75k £16.26k £14.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A