Financial history CYMDEITHAS EDWARD LLWYD

Charity number: 1126027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £25.20k £14.87k £19.34k £32.74k £26.38k
Total expenditure £25.64k £9.95k £21.95k £33.91k £31.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A