Financial history THE AGOONOREE (GREATER LONDON) TRUST FUND

Charity number: 303314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £4.90k £2.87k £3.15k £2.53k £4.97k
Total expenditure £5.06k £1.06k £0 £2.77k £6.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A